Peterson Motorcars, LLC et al v. BMW of North America, LLC

Plaintiff: Peterson Motorcars, LLC and David Peterson
Defendant: BMW of North Americal, LLC and BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00277
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, MOTION re #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Order Plaintiffs to File an Amended or Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint filed by David Peterson, Peterson Motorcars, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - 3-22-18 Article - Mini dealers_ Looking for the brand's vision) (Redding, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2019-06-10 Kentucky Motor Vehicle List (02371139x9E351)) (Watkins, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Sealed Document re #18 , #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (Watkins, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #18 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, MOTION re #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Order Plaintiffs to File an Amended or Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Watkins, J.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, MOTION re #6 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Order Plaintiffs to File an Amended or Redacted Version of the Amended Complaint by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-UNDER SEAL - 2016 Meeting Minutes, #2 Exhibit 2 - UNDER SEAL - 2017 Meeting Minutes, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 17, 2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - May 31, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - June 6, 2019 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fulton Affidavit, #7 Proposed Order Order) (Watkins, J.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM TO DISMISS COUNTS I, II, IV, V AND VI OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by David Peterson, Peterson Motorcars, LLC. (Redding, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by BMW of North America, LLC. (Watkins, J.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Watkins, J.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/13/2019 granting #12 Motion for Stephen M. Bledsoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #13 Motion for Kirk A. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Kirk A. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2863806. by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kirk A. Peterson, #2 Proposed Order) (Watkins, J.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Stephen M. Bledsoe to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2863794. by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Stephen M. Bledsoe, #2 Proposed Order) (Watkins, J.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Peterson, Peterson Motorcars, LLC. (Murrell, Dennis)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/9/2019, granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BMW be, and hereby is, granted an extension of time up to and including Friday, May 17, 2019 in which to file a response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. [D.E. #6 ]. (KD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC. (Watkins, J.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Watkins, J.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Tanner Watkins on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC (Watkins, J.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, filed by Peterson Motorcars, LLC, David Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Dealer Agreement) (Murrell, Dennis)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #4 filed by David Peterson, Peterson Motorcars, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annual Report of BMW of N Am, #2 Exhibit B- Annual Report of BMW (US) Holding) (Murrell, Dennis) Modified on 4/22/2019 to create link to order (KJA).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/15/2019 - Within ten (10) days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3). cc: Counsel (KD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (RLJ) Modified on 4/15/2019 to correct party name error by Clerk (RLJ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2844734.), filed by Peterson Motorcars, LLC, David Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dealership Agreement). (RLJ) Modified on 4/15/2019 to correct party name error by Clerk (RLJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson Motorcars, LLC et al v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peterson Motorcars, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Woodard Redding
Represented By: Matthew P. Dearmond
Represented By: Dennis D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Peterson
Represented By: Daniel Woodard Redding
Represented By: Matthew P. Dearmond
Represented By: Dennis D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North Americal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: R. Kenyon Meyer
Represented By: Kirk A. Peterson
Represented By: J. Tanner Watkins
Represented By: Daniel J. O'Gara
Represented By: Stephen M. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?