Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc. v. Perky Jerky, LLC

Plaintiff: Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc.
Defendant: Perky Jerky, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00281
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/7/2019. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to the Defendant, all dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED, and this matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado #5 is DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc. (Theriot, Janice)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer to the U.S.D.C. for the District of Colorado Reply In Support of Motion filed by Perky Jerky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Brian Levin) (Vance, Palmer)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer to the U.S.D.C. for the District of Colorado filed by Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Errata Ex C) (Theriot, Janice)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Perky Jerky, LLC COMPLETED on 4/21/2019. (MEJ)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/1/2019 granting #4 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado DN #5 SHALL be filed no later than close of business on 5/14/2019. Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado DN #5 SHALL be filed no later than close of business on 5/21/2019. cc: Counsel, USP (RLJ)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer to the U.S.D.C. for the District of Colorado by Defendant Perky Jerky, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Agreement, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Vance, Palmer)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Motion of Defendant for Expedited Briefing Schedule by Defendant Perky Jerky, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- to the Motion of Defendant, #2 Proposed Order) (Vance, Palmer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Perky Jerky, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of complaint emailed to counsel. (MNM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perky Jerky, LLC, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2845885, filed by Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc. v. Perky Jerky, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perky Jerky, LLC
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Processing and Cold Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence John Zielke
Represented By: Janice M. Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?