Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Jones
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00323
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non-Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1 of 3, #8 Medical Records Part 2 of 3, #9 Medical Records Part 3 of 3) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gilbert, L.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gilbert, L.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Case reassigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III pursuant to General Order No. 2018-02.cc: Counsel (AEH)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 6/6/2019. (MEJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses forwarded to the USM for service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (MEJ)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/6/2019 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is ordered to file Jones' complaint and to issue summons. The United States Marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this Order on the Defendant. The United States shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/6/2019 granting #4 Motion for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
May 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2859199. by Plaintiff Patricia L. Jones (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Chermol, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (MNM)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patricia L. Jones (MNM)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patricia L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Jones
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?