Bowman v. Fiorini et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Janet Bowman
Defendant: David Fiorini and Kristen Cunningham
Case Number: 3:2019cv00331
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331ag
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Kristen Cunningham, David Fiorini. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (AME)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/27/2019. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue the summonses and send them to Plaintiff for service on Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all nondispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct one or more settlement conferences in this matter.cc: Counsel, RSE-CM (AME)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Letter re Additional Information by Vivian Janet Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (MEJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number L33060411 by Vivian Janet Bowman. (JLP)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/19/2019. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider (DN #10 ) is DENIED. As such, Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee to the Clerk of this Court within 21 days from entry of this Order. Checks shall be made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and mailed to the following address: Office of the Clerk, United States District Court, Western District of Kentucky, 601 West Broadway, Ste. 106, Louisville, KY 40202-2249. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to pay the $400.00 filing fee within the time allowed will result in dismissal of the action. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summonses by Vivian Janet Bowman re #1 Complaint. (MEJ)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re DN #4 . Mail addressed to Vivian Janet Bowman. (MEJ)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vivian Janet Bowman. (JM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency filed by Vivian Janet Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (AME)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vivian Janet Bowman. (MEJ)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/6/2019 denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall tender the $400.00 filing fee to the Clerk of this Court within 30 days from entry of this Order. Checks shall be made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and mailed to the following address: Office of the Clerk, United States District Court, Western District of Kentucky, 601 West Broadway, Ste. 106, Louisville, KY 40202-2249. Plaintiff is WARNED that failure to tender the $400.00 filing fee within the time allowed will result in dismissal of the action. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Wrong Complaint form used. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/9/2019. (AME)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Vivian Janet Bowman (AME)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristen Cunningham, David Fiorini, filed by Vivian Janet Bowman. (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Fiorini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Janet Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?