Guillory v. Swan Financial Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Guillory
Defendant: David Randall Raque, Thomas Edward Sexton and Swan Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00366
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/12/2019 granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrew R. Frisch is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the plaintiff in this action. If during the pendency of this action, Andrew R. Frisch is disbarred, suspended from practice, is not in good standing with the Bar to which he is a member, or is subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, he must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by Daniel Guillory re #5 Notice of Deficiency, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Frisch, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: Certificate of Good Standing must be from the highest court of the state, territory, or the District of Columbia in which the attorney is a resident. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/6/2019. (RLK)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Randall Raque, Thomas Edward Sexton, Swan Financial Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Sexton, #2 Summons - Raque) (AME)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Andrew R. Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125.00), by Plaintiff Daniel Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bar Memberships, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order). (AME)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Randall Raque, Thomas Edward Sexton, Swan Financial Corporation (Filing fee $400.00), filed by Daniel Guillory. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Consent to Join, #4 Envelope). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillory v. Swan Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Guillory
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Randall Raque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Edward Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swan Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?