Gillum v. Cigna Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Sarah Gillum
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00372
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cigna Group Insurance. (Murphy, Grace)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/19/2019, granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William B. Wahlheim, Jr. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Judge Claria Horn Boom (EBOC) on 6/18/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/18/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Group Insurance. (Murphy, Grace)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2884033. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency as to William B. Wahlheim, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal,Reason for Deficiency: No Admission or Pro Hac Vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/26/2019. (MLG)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/5/2019 granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Grace Robinson Murphy is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendant in this action. If during the pendency of this action, Grace Robinson Murphy is disbarred, suspended from practice, is not in good standing with the Bar to which she is a member, or is subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, she must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/5/2019 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant SHALL have up to and including 6/18/2019, within which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2875235. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Grace Murphy, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Grace)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Murphy, Grace)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed copy to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Connecticut General Corporation, Cigna Holdings Inc., Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Group Insurance. (AME)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Group Insurance from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-07148. (Filing fee $ 400.00), filed by Cigna Group Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Plan Documents). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillum v. Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Gillum
Represented By: William B. Walheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?