Barnhouse v. Hearing Lab Technology, LLC
Plaintiff: Janet Barnhouse
Defendant: Hearing Lab Technology, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00375
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/21/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hearing Lab Technology, LLC. (Falkner, Rheanne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted via Secretary of State as to Hearing Lab Technology, LLC. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hearing Lab Technology, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hearing Lab Technology, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0644-287067), filed by Janet Barnhouse. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - FMLA Request, #3 Exhibit B - Top Performer Email). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhouse v. Hearing Lab Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Barnhouse
Represented By: Randall S. Strause
Represented By: Parker M. Wornall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearing Lab Technology, LLC
Represented By: Denise M. Motta
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?