Maina Enterprises, LLC v. Pro Performance Sports, LLC
Plaintiff: Maina Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Pro Performance Sports, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00397
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pro Performance Sports, LLC. (Muenkel, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maina Enterprises, LLC. Pro Performance Sports, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Welling, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2019: The time for PPS to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED by thirty (30) days, up to and including Thursday, 8/1/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/6/2019 granting #7 Motion for Attorney Jonathan A. Muenkel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: DN 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until Aug. 1, 2019 for Defendant. Error: Wrong event selected; Correction: Re-docketed as Agreed Order/Stipulation. (AME)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until Aug. 1, 2019 for Defendant by Plaintiff Maina Enterprises, LLC (Welling, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jonathan A. Muenkel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125.00 - Receipt Number: L33060430) by Defendant Pro Performance Sports, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). (KD)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/17/2019 granting #5 Motion for David A. Welling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint (ALS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for David A. Welling to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125.00 - Receipt Number L33060129) by Plaintiff Maina Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplemental Answers, #3 Proposed Order) (KD)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pro Performance Sports, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pro Performance Sports, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number L33060129) filed by Maina Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 License Agreement, #2 Amended Agreement, #3 Patent, #4 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maina Enterprises, LLC v. Pro Performance Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maina Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: David A. Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Performance Sports, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Muenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?