Neal-Hickman v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Earlene Neal-Hickman
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00410
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Earlene Neal-Hickman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 6/14/2019, granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. cc: Counsel (KD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanCleave, Buddy)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/7/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed copy of Notice to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (AME)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Prudential Insurance Company of America from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003063. (Filing fee $400.00; receipt number 0644-2879996), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Disclosure Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Group Insurance Contract). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal-Hickman v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Buddy J. VanCleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlene Neal-Hickman
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?