Hudgison v. Pioneer Credit Company et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Hudgison, II
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Pioneer Credit Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00421
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PIONEER CREDIT COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/30/2019. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pioneer Credit Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and each party shall bear its own fees and costs. cc: Counsel of Record (ALS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Order by Bernard Hudgison, II. (Hemminger, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pioneer Credit Company. (Smith, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Lamkin on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (Lamkin, Melissa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mariner Finance, LLC for Pioneer Credit Company. by Pioneer Credit Company. (Smith, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of Pioneer Credit Company (Smith, William)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Credit Company, Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Experian, #2 Summons - Pioneer, #3 Summons - Trans Union). (AME)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Credit Company, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0644-2882256), filed by Bernard Hudgison, II. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudgison v. Pioneer Credit Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Company
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Represented By: Melissa R. Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Hudgison, II
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?