McClain et al v. Oasis Legal Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: Cheston Mason, Nickesha McClain and May King
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00426
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/6/2019. Granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file its replies on or before 8/28/2019. (ALS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Donald)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Cheston Mason, Nickesha McClain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mason Affidavit) (Craig, James)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/25/2019 granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motions on or before July 31, 2019. (ALS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs Cheston Mason, Nickesha McClain (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting extension of time to file responses) (Larson, Tyler)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/22/2019 granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion on or before 7/24/2019. (ALS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Plaintiffs Cheston Mason, Nickesha McClain (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Craig, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 7/1/2019 granting #11 Motion to Strike and Substitute. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
June 24, 2019 Remark - Verified that Attorney Christine E. Skoczylas and Attorney William M. McErlean are in good standing in the State of Illinois. (KD)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to D. Kelly re #7 Request for Fee Refund. (MLG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike and Substitute #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint, #9 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations. Document or Part to be Stricken and/or Substituted: Ex. 1 and Ex. 2 by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted King Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Mason Agreement, #3 Proposed Order) (Skoczylas, Christine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Ex. 1 - STRICKEN DOCUMENT - stricken from record pursuant to DN #12 , # 3 Ex. 2 - STRICKEN DOCUMENT - stricken from record pursuant to DN #12 , #4 Ex. 3 - King Attorney Acknowledgement, #5 Ex. 4 - Mason Attorney Acknowledgement, #6 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Donald) Modified on 7/1/2019 (RLJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (RLJ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Ex. 1 - STRICKEN DOCUMENT - stricken from record pursuant to DN #12 , # 3 Ex. 2 - STRICKEN DOCUMENT - stricken from record pursuant to DN #12 ,#5 Ex. 4 - Mason Attorney Acknowledgement, #6 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Donald) Modified on 7/1/2019 (RLJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (RLJ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #9 Ex. 3 - King Attorney Acknowledgement. (RLJ)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/17/2019, GRANTING #5 and #6 Motions for Christine E. Skoczylas and William M. McErlean to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Fee Refund re #6 MOTION for William M. McErlean to Appear Pro Hac Vice William M. McErlean Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2885214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-initial receipt, #2 Exhibit 2-subsequent receipt) by Oasis Legal Finance, LLC. (Kelly, Donald)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for William M. McErlean to Appear Pro Hac Vice William M. McErlean Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2885214. by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Donald)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christine E. Skoczylas Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2885118. by Defendant Oasis Legal Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Donald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-002802. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Legal Finance, LLC. (ALS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Legal Finance, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-002802 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2883250) filed by Oasis Legal Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Winkiel Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3-State Court Record) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain et al v. Oasis Legal Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Legal Finance, LLC
Represented By: William M McErlean
Represented By: Marianna J. Michael
Represented By: Christine Skoczylas
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheston Mason
Represented By: Tyler A. Larson
Represented By: James Robert Craig
Represented By: Michele Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickesha McClain
Represented By: Tyler A. Larson
Represented By: James Robert Craig
Represented By: Michele Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: May King
Represented By: Tyler A. Larson
Represented By: James Robert Craig
Represented By: Michele Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?