International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369 v. ADT, LLC
Petitioner: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369 and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369
Respondent: ADT, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00430
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards (EBOC) on 7/29/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Participating counsel shall contact Judge Edwards' Case Manager, Ashley Henry, by e-mail at ashley_henry@kywd.uscourts.gov with their preferred contact numbers by 9/20/2019. cc: Counsel (AME)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/29/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369. (Basil, Benjamin) Modified on 7/29/2019 to clarify title of document (MEJ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369 by ADT, LLC. (Miller, Wendy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369. ADT, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified mail card, #2 Receipt Certified mail card) (Basil, Benjamin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ADT, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MEJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369 re #1 Complaint, (Basil, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369 re #1 Complaint, (Basil, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS: re #1 Complaint - Summons was not tendered with the Complaint. (AME)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC Filing fee ($400.00, receipt number 0644-2884744), filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Decision). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369 v. ADT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ADT, LLC
Represented By: Wendy V. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers AFL-CIO, Local Union 369
Represented By: Benjamin S. Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO, Local Union No. 369
Represented By: Benjamin S. Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?