Pleiss v. National Credit Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Pleiss
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and National Credit Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00437
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/8/2019 granting #5 Motion for Katrina DeMarte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Melanie Pleiss. (DeMarte, Katrina)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melanie Pleiss. (DeMarte, Katrina)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Katrina DeMarte to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2914897. by Plaintiff Melanie Pleiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (DeMarte, Katrina)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC and National Credit Systems, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax) (MNM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC and National Credit Systems, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2886020, filed by Melanie Pleiss. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleiss v. National Credit Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Katrina M. DeMarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Pleiss
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?