OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC v. Digital Med, LLC
Plaintiff: OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC
Defendant: Digital Med, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00468
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Digital Med, LLC COMPLETED on 8/19/2019. Secretary of State return states 8/6/2019. (KD)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC. (Park, Young-Eun)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing or Determination re: Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (MNM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Digital Med, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Digital Med, LLC, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2894433, filed by OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent and Trademark, #3 Exhibit C - Website, #4 Exhibit D - Website, #5 Exhibit E - California Secretary of State Information, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC v. Digital Med, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Med, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneMD-Louisville PLLC, LLC
Represented By: Karen K. Gaunt
Represented By: Sara Suleiman
Represented By: Young-Eun Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?