Hamilton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roger Hamilton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00471
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Hamilton as to:Commissioner of Social Security (Harden, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Hamilton as to:Commissioner of Social Security (Harden, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Hamilton as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Harden, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 7/23/2019. (AME)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (AME)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons). (AME)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0644-2895001), filed by Roger Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hamilton
Represented By: Michael L. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?