Cummer v. Cigna Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Kerry Cummer
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00478
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446er
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. The above-referenced action be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice, and stricken from the Court's docket, with each party to bear its own costs. (ALS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #8 by Cigna Group Insurance. (Calhoun, David)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/14/2019. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, all dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED, and this matter is STRICKEN from the ACTIVE DOCKET with leave to reinstate within forty-five (45) days if the settlement is not consummated. The parties may tender a supplemental order of dismissal with prejudice if they so desire. cc: Counsel of Record (ALS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Cigna Group Insurance (Calhoun, David)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 7/22/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Group Insurance. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 18-CI-6332. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Group Insurance. by Cigna Group Insurance. (ALS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cigna Group Insurance from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-6332 (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2896473) filed by Cigna Group Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummer v. Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Cummer
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?