Clayton v. Comenity Bank et al
Plaintiff: Anna Clayton
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Comenity Bank, Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00492
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/7/2019, re #12 - Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have up to and including September 4, 2019, in which to file a responsive pleading in this matter. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Bank of America, N.A.. (Wathen, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. by Bank of America, N.A.. (Wathen, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/31/2019, granting #6 - Defendant Comenity Bank SHALL have up to and including August 26, 2019, in which to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Alliance Data Systems Corporation, Corporate Parent Comenity LLC, Corporate Parent ADS Alliance Data Systems, Inc for Comenity Bank. by Comenity Bank. (Manley, Reid)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Comenity Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Bank of America, N.A. COMPLETED on 7/24/2019. Secretary of State return states 7/12/2019. (KD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Comenity Bank COMPLETED on 7/15/2019. (MEJ)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (AME)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2898467), filed by Anna Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Comenity Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Brian M. Bennett
Represented By: John S. Wathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Clayton
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?