Tauscher v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Dennis Tauscher
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00498
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 8/27/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Parties to meet within 21 days; Parties to file joint report within 10 days following meeting. cc: counsel (JM)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/26/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Felsen, Liam)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003617. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America. by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (ALS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003617 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2899601) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tauscher v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Liam E. Felsen
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tauscher
Represented By: Zachary J. Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?