Kelley v. Credit First National Association et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie Kelley
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Credit First National Association and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00502
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom. Granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thanh-Thuy T. Luong is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. in this action. cc: Counsel of Record (ALS)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #13 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2934892. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order) (Brannon, Margaret)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2934892. by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/12/2019; re #10 Stipulation filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, SHALL have up to and including 9/6/2019, within which to respond to plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (ALS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/8/2019, re #7 - Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., SHALL have up to and including August 15, 2019, within which to respond to plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Proof of Service for Experian CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bobbie Kelley Proof for Experian (Kurtz, Sheilah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Proof of Service for Equifax CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bobbie Kelley Proof for Equifax (Kurtz, Sheilah)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proof of Service for Credit First CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bobbie Kelley Proof for Credit First (Kurtz, Sheilah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit First National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (AME)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credit First National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2901353), filed by Bobbie Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Credit Report, #4 Exhibit C - FCRA Signed Dispute Letter, #5 Exhibit D - May Credit Report) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Credit First National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit First National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Thanh-Thuy T. Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Kelley
Represented By: Sheilah Galvez Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?