Hudgison v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al
Plaintiff: Lashunda Hudgison
Defendant: Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00505
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Kenney, Jonathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation. (Valenti, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/14/2019; re #7 . Defendant Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation shall have an extension up to and including 8/23/2019, in which to file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 . (ALS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation. (Valenti, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency COMPLETED on 8/5/2019. Secretary of State return states 7/23/2019. (KD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Experian, #2 Summons - Iowa Student Loan, #3 Summons - Pennsylvania Higher, #4 Summons - Trans Union) (ALS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2901898) filed by Lashunda Hudgison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudgison v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Student Loan Liquidity Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Valenti
Represented By: Hayden A. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashunda Hudgison
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?