Conley v. Comenity Bank et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Conley
Defendant: Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT COMENITY BANK'S SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/5/2019 granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Comenity is allowed until 9/18/2019 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint, re #1 . cc: Counsel; Equifax Information Services, LLC (CDF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Second) by Defendant Comenity Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Alliance Data Systems Corporation, Corporate Parent Comenity LLC, Corporate Parent ADS Alliance Data Systems, Inc. for Comenity Bank. by Comenity Bank. (Manley, Reid)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/16/2019 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Comety shall have through 9/4/2019 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel(JM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Comenity Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to David Hemminger re #4 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Comenity Bank COMPLETED on 8/1/2019. Postal receipt shows signed for on 7/24/2019. (JM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Fee Refund by Courtney Conley. (Hemminger, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Equifax, #2 Summons - Experian) (ALS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2901192) filed by Courtney Conley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. Comenity Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Conley
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?