Cannon v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lakeema A. Cannon
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Mariner Finance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00508
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (AGREED) by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/8/2019 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant Mariner to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 9/3/2019. cc: Counsel (AME)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/8/2019 granting #5 Motion for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MF Raven Holdings, Inc. for Mariner Finance, LLC. by Mariner Finance, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (AGREED) by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Anna-Katrina S. Christakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2916078. by Defendant Mariner Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 7/15/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AME)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Mariner Finance, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2901550), filed by Lakeema A. Cannon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Finance, LLC
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeema A. Cannon
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?