State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. St. Stephens Cemetery Association et al
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company and State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co.
Defendant: Crystal Ray, Pamela Wilkerson, Tina Clark, Robin Thomas, Tony Bostic, Barbara Ann Houser, Mark Holland, St. Stephens Cemetery Association, Kelly Bryant, Tina Seaton, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr. and Herb Zimmerman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00513
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/11/2019. Defendants Mark Holland, Tony Bostic, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr., and Herb Zimmerman, shall have by and through 10/9/2019 in which to file an answer or otherwise to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 . cc: Counsel (MEJ)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. cc: Counsel, CM-Hale (RLJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 , #5 by Tony Bostic, Mark Holland, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr, Herb Zimmerman. (Gray, Elisabeth)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Gray on behalf of Tony Bostic, Mark Holland, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr, Herb Zimmerman (Gray, Elisabeth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Burns on behalf of St. Stephens Cemetery Association (Burns, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tony Bostic, Kelly Bryant, Tina Clark, Mark Holland, Barbara Ann Houser, Crystal Ray, Tina Seaton, St. Stephens Cemetery Association, Robin Thomas, Pamela Wilkerson, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr, Herb Zimmerman. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Bruce Zimmerman, #2 Summons Crystal Ray, #3 Summons Herbert Zimmerman, #4 Summons Kelly Bryant, #5 Summons Mark Holland, #6 Summons Pamela Wilkerson, #7 Summons Robin Thomas, #8 Summons St. Stephens Cemetery Assoc., #9 Summons Tina Clark, #10 Summons Tina Seaton, #11 Summons Tony Bostic) (ALS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Tony Bostic, Kelly Bryant, Tina Clark, Mark Holland, Barbara Ann Houser, Crystal Ray, Tina Seaton, St. Stephens Cemetery Association, Robin Thomas, Pamela Wilkerson, Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr, Herb Zimmerman (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2902880) filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2nd Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit D - Letter Correspondence) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. St. Stephens Cemetery Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Bostic
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ann Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Holland
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Stephens Cemetery Association
Represented By: Michael T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Zimmerman, Sr.
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Zimmerman
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony M. Zelli
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Anthony M. Zelli
Represented By: M. Trent Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?