Hutchins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brandon P. Hutchins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv00523
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa A. Palmer (Palmer, Melissa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 8/21/2019. (AME)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses forwarded to the USM for service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (AME)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/30/2019 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Attorney Melissa A. Palmer. The Clerk of Court shall file his complaint (DN 1) and issue summons. The United States Marshal shall serve the summons with a copy of the complaint (DN 1) on the defendant. The United States shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel(AME)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2905512. by Plaintiff Brandon P. Hutchins (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Palmer, Melissa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (AME)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon P. Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (AME)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Brandon P. Hutchins. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order) (AME) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (AME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon P. Hutchins
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?