J.A. et al v. Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: S.A. and J.A.
Defendant: Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky, Benjamin Gies, Dr. Martin Pollio, Dr. Chris Kolb, Diane Porter, Anthony Sieg, Michael Newman, Jefferson County Public Schools, Victory Gentry, Chris Brady, Linda Duncan, James Craig, Corrie Dhull, Brian Raho and Jefferson County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00550
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Chris Brady, James Craig, Corrie Dhull, Linda Duncan, Victory Gentry, Benjamin Gies, Jefferson County Board of Education. (Reisz, Katherine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of S.A., #2 Proposed Order Overruling and Remanding to State Court) (Henry, Kenneth)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings: District Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings RECUSES from this matter and the action is reassigned to the docket of District Judge Charles R. Simpson, III United States District Court Judge, for all further proceedings. cc: counsel, RK (JM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky, Chris Brady, James Craig, Corrie Dhull, Linda Duncan, Victory Gentry, Benjamin Gies, Chris Kolb, Michael Newman, Martin Pollio, Diane Porter, Brian Raho, Anthony Sieg (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Collins, Dana)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE - re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003492. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by S.A., J.A. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003492. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2915430) filed by S.A., J.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.A. et al v. Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Jefferson County, Kentucky
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Gies
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Martin Pollio
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Chris Kolb
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Porter
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sieg
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Newman
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Public Schools
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Gentry
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Brady
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Duncan
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Craig
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrie Dhull
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Raho
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Dana L. Collins
Represented By: Katherine T. Reisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?