Albin v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Plaintiff: John Albin
Defendant: Chief Steve Conrad, Officer Charles Meek, Louisville Metro Government and Officer Michael Pugh
Case Number: 3:2019cv00576
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steve Conrad, Louisville Metro Government. (Carroll, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Albin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pride, Kevin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Steve Conrad, Louisville Metro Government, Charles Meek, Michael Pugh (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Carroll, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Steve Conrad, Louisville Metro Government, Charles Meek, Michael Pugh. (Carroll, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-4492. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-4492 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2922662), filed by Michael Pugh, Louisville Metro Government, Steve Conrad, Charles Meek. (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albin v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Steve Conrad
Represented By: John Carroll
Represented By: John F. Carroll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Charles Meek
Represented By: John Carroll
Represented By: John F. Carroll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: John Carroll
Represented By: John F. Carroll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Pugh
Represented By: John Carroll
Represented By: John F. Carroll, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Albin
Represented By: Kevin Pride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?