Ruplinger v. Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government et al
Plaintiff: Clara Ruplinger
Defendant: Doug Hamilton, Metropolitan Department of Corrections, Greg Fischer, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government and Mark Bolton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00583
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Clara Ruplinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Parry, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMIT Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/10/2019 granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff is permitted up to 31 pages in her Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. cc: Counsel (AME)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark Bolton, Greg Fischer, Doug Hamilton, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Metropolitan Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Rivera, Susan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Clara Ruplinger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Abney, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Clara Ruplinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Rivera Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 LMDC Departmental Policy 01-5.15, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Post Order BF-05, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 LRC Local Mandate Fiscal Impact Estimate) (Parry, Kelly)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 9/12/2019. The deadline for Plaintiff to file her memorandum in response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is extended until 9/13/2019. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Parry on behalf of Clara Ruplinger (Parry, Kelly)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Clara Ruplinger. (Reece, Jeremiah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/19/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Mark Bolton, Greg Fischer, Doug Hamilton, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Metropolitan Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Rivera, Susan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-4536. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Department of Corrections, Greg Fischer, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Doug Hamilton, Mark Bolton from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19CI004536. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2924277), filed by Metropolitan Department of Corrections, Greg Fischer, Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government, Doug Hamilton, Mark Bolton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Complaint, #4 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruplinger v. Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Hamilton
Represented By: Susan K. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Department of Corrections
Represented By: Susan K. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Fischer
Represented By: Susan K. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville/Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By: Susan K. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bolton
Represented By: Susan K. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Ruplinger
Represented By: Soha T. Saiyed
Represented By: Jeremiah W. Reece
Represented By: Paul S. Abney
Represented By: Kelly M. Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?