Pollock v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Petitioner: Kenyon Messiah Pollock
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00584
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Letter filed by Kenyon Messiah Pollock. (ALS)
September 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number L33061390 by Kenyon Messiah Pollock. (JLP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Reason for Deficiency: Filing fee not paid. Application to proceed without prepayment of fees not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/20/2019. (KD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenyon Messiah Pollock. (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollock v. Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenyon Messiah Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?