Whitaker v. Circle K Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angela Whitaker
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc. and Mac
Case Number: 3:2019cv00591
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 10/18/2019: In-person Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/18/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-RSE. (ARM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY RESPONSES by Circle K Stores, Inc. (Pullen, Andrew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Oldham Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-00345. cc: Counsel; Oldham Circuit Court (ALS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
August 20, 2019 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Oldham Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2) by Circle K Stores, Inc.. (ALS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Canadian Alimentation Couche Tarde, Other Affiliate Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC for Circle K Stores, Inc.. by Circle K Stores, Inc.. (ALS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Circle K Stores, Inc. from Oldham Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00345. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2927460) filed by Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit 2-Deft Response to RFA, #4 Exhibit 3-Pltf Answers to Discovery, #5 Exhibit 4-KY SOS, #6 Exhibit 5-Annual Report) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Circle K Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Pullen
Represented By: William K. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac
Represented By: Andrew P. Pullen
Represented By: William K. Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Whitaker
Represented By: Armand I. Judah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?