Crisafulli v. The Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Amy Crisafulli
Defendant: Benefit Management Services and The Hartford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00614
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446er
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/17/2019: The time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by an additional fourteen (14) days from the current deadline of 10/23/2019, up to and including 11/6/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by The Hartford. (Mathisen, Eric)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/5/2019 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are granted an extension of time to and including 10/23/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/5/2019 granting #7 Motion for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2935904. by Defendants Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-04805. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (ALS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Benefit Management Services, The Hartford (ALS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-04805 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2933466) filed by Benefit Management Services, The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - state court record, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisafulli v. The Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Management Services
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Crisafulli
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?