Tubbs v. Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Jason Tubbs
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00639
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/26/2019. Tubb's claims against Navy Federal Credit Union are DISMISSED without prejudice. Tubbs and Navy Federal Credit Union shall file an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to reinstate Tubbss claims against Navy Federal Credit Union within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order in the event the settlement is not consummated. This Order does not affect Tubbss claims against any other defendant. cc: Counsel (AME)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/23/2019. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is GRANTED IN PART, and the Clerk is directed to change the case caption to reflect that the proper name of the Defendant is Navy Federal Credit Union. The Consent Motion (DN #12 ) is DENIED IN PART as moot regarding the requested extension given the recently-filed Notice of Settlement (DN #13 ). cc: Counsel (MEJ)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Tubbs (Hemminger, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct and Extend Time for Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union to file its Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 Complaint, Caption by Defendant Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Joint Consent Motion and Extension) (Falkner, Rheanne) Modified on 10/11/2019 to clarify title of document (MEJ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rheanne D. Falkner on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation (Falkner, Rheanne)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation COMPLETED on 10/1/2019. (AME)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/11/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (AME)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2940330), filed by Jason Tubbs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tubbs v. Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Tubbs
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?