Shelton v. Credit Plus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William E. Shelton, Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Credit Plus, Inc. and TD Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00643
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/2/2019: TD Bank USA, N.A. shall file is responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 10/25/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Scheumann, Chapin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William E. Shelton, Jr. Credit Plus, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Hemminger, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit Plus, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank USA, N.A.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax, #2 Summons TD Bank) (ALS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Credit Plus, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, TD Bank USA, N.A. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2941570) filed by William E. Shelton, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Credit Plus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Chapin E. Scheumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Shelton, Jr.
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?