Sweeney v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Pruitt Sweeney
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00667
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Pruitt Sweeney. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/22/2019 granting #9 Motion for Jennifer E. Burgees to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #10 Motion for Megan E. Troy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Megan E Troy to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2963105. by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C Consent, #4 Exhibit D ECF Training, #5 Proposed Order) (VanCleave, Buddy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Jennifer E Burgess to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2960589. by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C Consent, #4 Exhibit D ECF Training, #5 Proposed Order) (VanCleave, Buddy)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 10/9/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Parties shall comply as set forth in order. cc: Counsel (AME)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (VanCleave, Buddy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/26/2019 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, shall have through and including 10/9/2019 in which to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (AME)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order) (VanCleave, Buddy)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/19/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Prudential Insurance Company of America from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-005374 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2946468). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pruitt Sweeney
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Buddy J. VanCleave
Represented By: Jennifer E. Burgess
Represented By: Megan E. Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?