Mohr Partners, Inc. v. CBRE Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mohr Partners, Inc.
Defendant: CBRE Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00677
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBRE Group, Inc.. (Delgado, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant CBRE Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Delgado, William)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/15/2019 granting #7 Motion. Haleigh Hill Jones is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Plaintiff in this action. If during the pendency of this action, Haleigh Hill Jones is disbarred, suspended from practice, is not in good standing with the Bar to which she is a member, or is subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, Haleigh Hill Jones must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/15/2019 granting #6 Motion. Tom Hill Crawford III is granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the Plaintiff in this action. If during the pendency of this action, Tom Hill Crawford III is disbarred, suspended from practice, is not in good standing with the Bar to which he is a member, or is subject to any other disciplinary action by any court, state, territory or the District of Columbia, Tom Hill Crawford III must immediately notify the Court and provide information necessary for the Court to evaluate whether continued admission in this case is appropriate. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CBRE GROUP, INC. TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/15/2019. Defendant CBRE GROUP, INC. shall have until and including 11/1/2019 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by CBRE Group, Inc.. (Delgado, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Haleigh Hill Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mohr Partners, Inc. Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2961850. by Plaintiff Mohr Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Ramsey, Ian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Tom (Trey) Hill Crawford III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mohr Partners, Inc. Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2961837. by Plaintiff Mohr Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Ramsey, Ian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mohr Partners, Inc.. CBRE Group, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Ramsey, Ian)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohr Partners, Inc.. All Defendants. (Ramsey, Ian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CBRE Group, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against CBRE Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2947733) filed by Mohr Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohr Partners, Inc. v. CBRE Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE Group, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohr Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Ian T. Ramsey
Represented By: Haleigh Hill Jones
Represented By: Tom Hill Crawford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?