Irvin et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Clara Arrebato Pedroso, Katherine Hernandez Arrebato and D'Ella Irvin
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00690
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND AND ATTORNEY FEES signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/22/2019. The plaintiffs SHALL have up to and including December 17, 2019, within which to file a Reply to defendant's Response [R. 14] to plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Attorney Fees [R. 10]. cc: Counsel(KJA)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order by Clara Arrebato Pedroso, Katherine Hernandez Arrebato, D'Ella Irvin by Clara Arrebato Pedroso, Katherine Hernandez Arrebato, D'Ella Irvin. (Willis, Damon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Donald Vinciguerra) (Klapheke, David)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 MOTION for Harnaik (Nick) Kahlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #13 MOTION for Joseph A. Cancila, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing. Error: Motions entered in error. Motions previously e-filed at DNs #8 and #9 . Correction: The Court will take no action on DNs #12 and #13 . (KD)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Joseph A. Cancila, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125.00, not paid. Attorney Cancila to mail check) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (KD)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Harnaik (Nick) Kahlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 125.00, not paid - check will be mailed by Attorney Kahlon) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order). (KD)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/25/2019, granting #8 and #9 - Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., and Harnaik (Nick) Kahlon are granted leave to appear pro hac vice for the defendant in this action. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Clara Arrebato Pedroso, Katherine Hernandez Arrebato, D'Ella Irvin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A.Hopkins v Staffing, #2 Exhibit Ex B.Schartel v One Source, #3 Exhibit Ex C.Disalvo v Intellicorp, #4 Exhibit Ex D.Houchens.Opinion, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ewing, C.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Harnaik (Nick) Kahlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2967922. by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration Form, #3 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Joseph A. Cancila Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2967905. by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 ECF Registration Form, #3 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Abstention by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Irvin Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Pedroso/Arrebato Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Cole Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Pedroso/Arrebato Payment Letter, #6 Exhibit E - Orders Denying Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit F - Motion to Transfer and Order Denying, #8 Exhibit G - Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit I - Court Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit J - Order dated July 9, 2014, #12 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/8/2019. Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall have up to and including October 16, 2019, in which to file a responsive pleading in this matter. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DJT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-005334. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2951556, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 4 Motion to file, #6 Exhibit 5 Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 2014 Order, #8 Exhibit 7 PIP Log) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Arrebato Pedroso
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Hernandez Arrebato
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Ella Irvin
Represented By: Damon B. Willis
Represented By: C. David Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Harnaik Kahlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?