Cripps v. Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: James Cripps
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co., Auto Club Services and Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00733
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/26/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 4:00 p.m. Eastern Time (3:00 p.m. Central Time) in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. At this hearing, Plaintiff's attorney shall show cause as to why he should not be held in contempt of Court and be sanctioned up to and including dismissal of the case. Plaintiff's attorney shall file a response to this Order to Show Cause no later than December 10, 2019. Please see Order for further details. cc: Counsel (KD)
November 25, 2019 Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Rule 16 Case-Management Conference held on 11/25/2019. (KD)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lanny King: Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference held on 11/18/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff did not appear on the call. Rescheduled Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Time (9:00 a.m. Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties may connect to the telephonic case-management conference by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1-877-848-7030and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. Please see Order for further details. cc: Counsel (KD)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 10/15/2019 - Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 12:00 p.m. EST (11:00 a.m. CDT) before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing Toll Free Meeting Number 1-877-848-7030 and entering Access Code 7238577#. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/11/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny King, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE : re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-004387. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (AME)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Auto Club Insurance Association for Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co. (AME)
October 10, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co. (AME)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-004387. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2960860), filed by Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents) (AME) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #2 Cover Sheet) (AME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cripps v. Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Ins. Co.
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Services
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cripps
Represented By: Thomas H. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?