Shafika, Inc. v. Motorist Mutual Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Shafika, Inc.
Defendant: Motorist Mutual Insurance Group
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 11/14/2019. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b) (1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Regina S. Edwards to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Claria Horn Boom no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (KD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-005558. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorist Mutual Insurance Group. (ALS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Orberson, Jr. on behalf of Motorist Mutual Insurance Group (ALS)
October 14, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 -1 by Motorist Mutual Insurance Group. (ALS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Motorist Mutual Insurance Group from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-005558. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2962095) filed by Motorist Mutual Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circuit Court Record, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafika, Inc. v. Motorist Mutual Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorist Mutual Insurance Group
Represented By: William B. Orberson, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shafika, Inc.
Represented By: Nader G. Shunnarah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?