Payment Alliance International, Inc. v. Yerkes
Plaintiff: Payment Alliance International, Inc.
Defendant: Christopher Yerkes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00744
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/27/2019 - This matter is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The parties are DIRECTED that any attempted enforcement of the injunction shall require a motion to reopen the case. (KD)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge David J. Hale on 11/27/2019, re #10 . (KD)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. Payment Alliance International, Inc. served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Marcus, Aaron)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/24/2019; The parties have reported that this matter has been settled. Accordingly, the telephonic status conference scheduled for 10/24/2019 is hereby CANCELED, to be rescheduled, if necessary, by subsequent order. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (NWT)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Payment Alliance International, Inc.. (Jakubowicz, Janet)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/21/2019 granting #7 Motion for Randy James Bruchmiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/17/2019 granting in part #5 Motion for TRO. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all nondispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct one or more settlement conferences in this matter. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge David J. Hale. The Court will initiate the call. Participating counsel shall contact Judge Hale's Case Manager, Natalie Thompson, at nthompson@kywd.uscourts.gov with their preferred contact numbers no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 10/23/2019. This Temporary Restraining Order is effective as of 12:00 p.m. on October 17, 2019, and will expire fourteen (14) days from its entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2) unless extended by subsequent order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Randy James Bruchmiller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2963001. by Plaintiff Payment Alliance International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jakubowicz, Janet)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Payment Alliance International, Inc. (AME)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Payment Alliance International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (AME)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent PAI Holdings, L.P. for Payment Alliance International, Inc. (AME)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Yerkes. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (AME)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Yerkes (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2962834), filed by Payment Alliance International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Alan Watson, #3 Exhibit B - Greathouse Holloway McFadden Trachtenberg letter) (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payment Alliance International, Inc. v. Yerkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payment Alliance International, Inc.
Represented By: Janet P. Jakubowicz
Represented By: Aaron W. Marcus
Represented By: Randy James Bruchmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Yerkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?