Cowan v. Metlife
Plaintiff: Janette Cowan
Defendant: Metlife and Metlife Disability
Case Number: 3:2019cv00748
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Metlife. (Thrash, Braxton)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards (EBOC) on 11/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 11:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/5/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Metlife. (Wahlheim, William)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/24/2019 granting #6 Motion for Attorney WIlliam B. Wahlheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/24/2019 granting #7 Motion for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/23/2019: Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is now 11/6/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2967416. by Defendant Metlife (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2967410. by Defendant Metlife (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Metlife. (Wahlheim, William)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metlife. (MNM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metlife from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-05827 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2963682). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowan v. Metlife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Disability
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Cowan
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?