United States of America v. Denison et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Revenue, Timothy Denison, Seterus, Inc. and Cynthia Chapman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00766
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Defendants Timothy Denison and Cynthia Chapman by Cynthia Chapman, Timothy Denison. (Sullivan, Maureen)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cynthia Chapman served on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Timothy Denison served on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kentucky Department of Revenue served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/13/2019 granting #7 Motion. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC D/B/A Mr. Cooper, as successor-in-interest to Seterus, Inc. is dropped as a party pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and shall therefore have no further obligations in this matter. Above referenced Plaintiff and Defendant shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees in the above- captioned matter. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Drop Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, as successor-in-interest to Seterus, Inc., as Party by Defendant Seterus, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER) (Bennett, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/27/2019 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendants may have until and including Friday, 12/20/2019, within which to retain counsel and file their respective answers. cc: Counsel, Timothy Denison (RLJ)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - United States' Response to the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Filed by Timothy Denison and Cynthia Chapman filed by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Cynthia Chapman, Timothy Denison (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension) (Denison, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cynthia Chapman, Timothy Denison, Kentucky Department of Revenue, Seterus, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Cynthia Chapman, #2 Summons Kentucky Department of Revenue, #3 Summons Seterus, Inc.) (ALS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynthia Chapman, Timothy Denison, Kentucky Department of Revenue, Seterus, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quitclaim Deed.pdf, #2 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Denison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Denison
Represented By: Timothy Denison
Represented By: Maureen Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Chapman
Represented By: Maureen Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander R. Kalyniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?