Washle v. Monro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Josh Washle
Defendant: Monroe, Inc. and Monro, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00779
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monro, Inc.. (Stopher, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards (EBOC) on 11/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The parties shall comply as set forth in the Order. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/31/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT REPLACEMENT by Monro, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stopher, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-004909. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monro, Inc.. (ALS)
October 29, 2019 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 -4) by Monro, Inc.. (ALS)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monro, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-004909 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2972183) filed by Monro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint in Jefferson Circuit Court, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Answer of Monro Inc.) (ALS) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/30/2019) (ALS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washle v. Monro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Represented By: Daniel R. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monro, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Represented By: Daniel R. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Washle
Represented By: Brian G. Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?