Preston 1210 LLC v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Preston 1210 LLC
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00796
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Expedite filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Banks, Darrin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiff Preston 1210 LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Eddins, H.)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. To fulfill your obligations under Rule 26, you must complete the enclosed Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, and return it to the Court by January 13, 2020.cc: Counsel of Record (ALS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 7.1 corporate disclosures) (Banks, Darrin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Preston 1210 LLC. Nationwide General Insurance Company served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Eddins, H.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nationwide General Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide General Insurance Company, filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2975994, filed by Preston 1210 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston 1210 LLC v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston 1210 LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Fiet
Represented By: H. Kevin Eddins
Represented By: Gregory L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Darrin W. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?