Cornette v. Wellpath, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Cornette
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC and Hamilton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00850
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wellpath, LLC. (Sharp, William)
January 1, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jimmy Cornette. (Sullenger, D.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wellpath, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sharp, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re second defendant ( #1 Complaint). (SMJ)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wellpath, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (SMJ)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Recreational Coordinator Hamilton and Wellpath, LLC; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2987857; filed by Jimmy Cornette. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #2 Summons). Modified on 11/21/2019 (SMJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornette v. Wellpath, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Charles M. Rutledge
Represented By: William E. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Cornette
Represented By: D. Wes Sullenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?