Dean v. New Albany Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard L. Dean, III
Defendant: Regional Acceptance Corporation, Skopos Financial, LLC, New Albany Motor Co., Inc., Chase Auto Finance, LLC, Exeter Finance, LLC, Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., The Huntington National Bank, Santander Consumer USA Inc. and Ally Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00855
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/3/2020 - Dean's claims against Ally Financial, Inc.; Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.; Chase Auto Finance, LLC; Exeter Finance, LLC; The Huntington National Bank; Regional Acceptance Corporation; Santander Consumer USA Inc.; and Skopos Financial, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate these defendants in the record of this matter. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to New Albany Motor Co, Inc. Dean and New Albany Co. shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. All dates and deadlines previously set in this matter are VACATED. (KD)
January 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard L. Dean, III (McKenzie, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant New Albany Motor Co., Inc. d/b/a Coyle Chevrolet by Richard L. Dean, III (McKenzie, James)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/27/2019 - Regional Acceptance's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DN #25 ) is GRANTED. Regional Acceptance shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 20, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/27/2019 - Defendant, New Albany Motor Co., Inc., d/b/a Coyle Chevrolet, shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 20, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/27/2019 - Defendant's Motion for Extension (DN #19 ) is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 13, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Regional Acceptance Corporation. by Regional Acceptance Corporation. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Regional Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT ALLY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/19/2019, granting #11 - Defendant Ally Financial Inc. shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 22, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/19/2019 - Capital One Auto Finance's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DN #15 ) is GRANTED. Capital One Auto Finance shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 13, 2020. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Agreed Order ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by New Albany Motor Co., Inc. by New Albany Motor Co., Inc.. (Smith, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Albany Motor Co., Inc.. (Smith, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of New Albany Motor Co., Inc. (Smith, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant The Huntington National Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blaske, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares Incorporated for The Huntington National Bank. by The Huntington National Bank. (Blaske, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan H. Blaske on behalf of The Huntington National Bank (Blaske, Nathan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (Manley, Reid)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/17/2019, granting #8 - Exeter's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DN #8 ) is GRANTED. Exeter shall have up to and including January 13, 2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/17/2019, granting #6 - Santander Consumer USA Inc. shall have up to and including January 20, 2020, to respond to the complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Ally Financial, Inc. by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Kenney on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Enzo Parent, LLC for Exeter Finance, LLC. by Exeter Finance, LLC. (Manley, Reid)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Exeter Finance, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Santander Holdings USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Banco Santander S.A., Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc. for Santander Consumer USA Inc.. by Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Bailen, Neal)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order by Santander Consumer USA Inc. by Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Bailen, Neal)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal F. Bailen on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Bailen, Neal)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/25/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (NWT)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc., Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Chase Auto Finance, LLC, Exeter Finance, LLC, Huntington National Bank, New Albany Motor Co., Inc., Regional Acceptance Corporation, Santander Consumer USA Inc., and Skopos Financial, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (SMJ)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Chase Auto Finance, LLC, Exeter Finance, LLC, Huntington National Bank, New Albany Motor Co., Inc., Regional Acceptance Corporation, Santander Consumer USA Inc., and Skopos Financial, LLC; Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2988820, filed by Richard L. Dean, III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 9 defendants) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. New Albany Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skopos Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Albany Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: William E. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Auto Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance, LLC
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Nathan H. Blaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Represented By: Neal F. Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Dean, III
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?