Sublett v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Omer C. Sublett
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00860
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Omer C. Sublett (Hemminger, David)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 1/9/2020 granting #7 Proposed Agreed Order: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall have through 1/24/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: Counsel(JM)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 11/14/2019. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b) (1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Regina S. Edwards to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Kenney on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Kenney, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. by TransUnion, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Equifax, #2 Summons as to Experian, #3 Summons as to Trans Union) (DJT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2990913., filed by Omer C. Sublett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sublett v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omer C. Sublett
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?