Autoglassnow, LLC v. Case et al
Plaintiff: Autoglassnow, LLC
Defendant: Ricky Case and Autoglass Rehab LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00864
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DEFENDANT Ricky Case, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Ricky Case. (Korus, Tyler)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Autoglassnow, LLC. Ricky Case waiver sent on 1/2/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Riddle, Benjamin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Autoglass Rehab LLC. (Korus, Tyler)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Autoglass Rehab LLC, Ricky Case. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Ricky Case) (DJT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Autoglass Rehab LLC, Ricky Case Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2991075., filed by Autoglassnow, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Non-Compete) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autoglassnow, LLC v. Case et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Case
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoglass Rehab LLC
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autoglassnow, LLC
Represented By: Chad M. Zimlich
Represented By: Benjamin L. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?