Lewis v. State of Kentucky
Petitioner: Paul William Lewis
Respondent: State of Kentucky
Case Number: 3:2019cv00868
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom; Petitioner's claims be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This is a final Order. The Court certifies that an appeal in forma pauperis would not be taken in good faith for the reasons set forth in the opinion. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). cc: Petitioner (pro se) (ALS)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/8/2020; the Court will dismiss this action by separate Order as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. cc: Petitioner (pro se) (ALS)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Paul William Lewis (ALS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Paul William Lewis. (MNM)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 60 (d)(1) against State of Kentucky, filed by Paul William Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Evidence in Support, #2 Cover Letter) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. State of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul William Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?