Thompson v. Seagle Pizza, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jenniffer Thompson
Defendant: Joseph M. Seagle and Seagle Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00016
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joe P. Leniski, Jr.. (Continue to receive notice:No) by Plaintiff Jenniffer Thompson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Withdrawal) (Suetholz, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Joe P. Leniski, Jr. re #1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/2/2020. (JM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jenniffer Thompson re #5 MOTION for Jay Forester to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Motion for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Suetholz, David)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Jay Forester re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion lacks wet signature; Certificate of good standing not provided. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/19/2020. (JM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Jay Forester to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filing fee $ 125.00 (receipt# L33062981) by Plaintiff Jenniffer Thompson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (JM)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jenniffer Thompson. All Defendants. (Suetholz, David)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph M. Seagle, Seagle Pizza, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Seagle) (DJT)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph M. Seagle, Seagle Pizza, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3017389., filed by Jenniffer Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Consent to be a Party Plaintiff) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Seagle Pizza, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenniffer Thompson
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Jay Forester
Represented By: Joe P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Seagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagle Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?