Stoess v. Amtel, LLC
Plaintiff: Sierra Stoess
Defendant: Amtel, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00098
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/17/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/16/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Amtel, LLC. (Inman, J.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/25/2020: By agreement of the parties, Defendant Amtel, LLC shall make its responsive filing by Wednesday,2/26/2020. By operation of this Order, Amtel's Motion for Extension #4 shall be denied as moot. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order by Amtel, LLC by Amtel, LLC. (Inman, J.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time TO MAKE RESPONSIVE FILING by Defendant Amtel, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Inman, J.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amtel, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-000084 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3038916). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoess v. Amtel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtel, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Stoess
Represented By: Timothy R. Greer
Represented By: Charles W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?