Salyers v. Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield
Plaintiff: Larissa Salyers
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield
Case Number: 3:2020cv00124
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 ea
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Doll, Cynthia)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court GRANTS the Defendants pro hac vice motion (DNs #8 Jill C. Taylor, #9 Christopher J. DeGroff). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larissa Salyers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shrewsbury, Marilyn)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Christopher J. DeGroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3056510. by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doll, Cynthia)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Jill C. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3051693. by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doll, Cynthia)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Christopher DeGroff re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/10/2020. (JM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Jill C. Taylor re #5 Motion to Dismiss. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/10/2020. (JM)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Doll, Cynthia)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Doll, Cynthia)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court. (DLW)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-000512 (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3044341). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michelle Jordanhazy, #3 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salyers v. Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield
Represented By: Christopher J. DeGroff
Represented By: Cynthia Blevins Doll
Represented By: Jill C. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Salyers
Represented By: Marilyn L. Shrewsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?